DARTMOUTH UNITED CHARITIES

Charity number: 203399
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2020 04 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 04 November 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2019 29 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 29 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2018 24 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 24 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2017 21 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 21 December 2017 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2016 21 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2016 21 December 2016 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)