Financial history DARTMOUTH UNITED CHARITIES

Charity number: 203399
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022
Total gross income £386.79k £429.31k £495.50k £476.42k £474.29k
Total expenditure £199.51k £187.04k £182.00k £175.60k £210.21k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £15.69k £1.54k