Trustees DARTMOUTH UNITED CHARITIES
Charity number: 203399

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JILL CAWLEY | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Robin Springett | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Michael Raymond Rowley | Trustee | 13 December 2021 |
|
|||||
LARA OSGOOD | Trustee | 08 March 2021 |
|
|||||
George Hardy | Trustee | 01 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
MATTHEW SIMON TREMLETT | Trustee | 08 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
Barrie French | Trustee | 08 September 2014 |
|
|||||
VANESSA GAYE DE GALLEANI | Trustee | 12 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
BETTY ELAINE FLEET | Trustee | 01 February 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.