AMELIA CARTER CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide a village hall to be run and maintained to a good standard by the Carter Institute Management Committee "without distinction of political, religious or other opinions" for the inhabitants of Kencot. Also to provide of financial relief either generally or individually to residents of Kencot who are in need, hardship or distress.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 12 April 1962: Standard registration
- THE CARTER INSTITUTE KENCOT (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gill Cox | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Susan Anne Patrick | Trustee | 12 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Wheeler | Trustee | 04 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Stella Margaret Chapman | Trustee | 23 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Wally Cox | Trustee | 13 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
Brian Anthony Sly | Trustee | 29 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
Jay Mathews | Trustee | 16 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
REVEREND HARRY CAMPBELL MACINNES | Trustee |
|
||||||
MR D K CHAPMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR TIM STOCKFORD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.96k | £13.49k | £3.87k | £4.53k | £7.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.60k | £4.18k | £6.49k | £3.99k | £7.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 05/05/1911 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 15/01/1974 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 29/03/2012
Charitable objects
(1) VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF KENCOT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLICITAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. (2) RELIEVING EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE PARISH OF KENCOT WHO ARE IN CONDITION OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY OR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES CALCULATED TO REDUCE THE NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OF SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF KENCOT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ivy Nook
Kencot
LECHLADE
GL7 3QU
- Phone:
- 01367860250
- Email:
- gill.e.cox@talk21.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window