DUTTON'S AND ALLEN'S ALMSHOUSES

Charity number: 203546
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 29 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 29 August 2020 121 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 19 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 19 February 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 29 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

29 May 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 29 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 29 June 2017 On time Download