SKENE WELFARE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 203623
Removed charity
Governing document
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14 MAY 1959 AS AMENDED 15 OCTOBER 1968, AS AMENDED 3 SEPTEMBER 1996
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE MORAL WELFARE IN THE CITY OF OXFORD.
Organisation type
No information available
Registration history
  • 18 February 1964 : registered
  • 23 August 2000 : removed (CEASED TO EXIST)
Other names

No other names

What the charity did
    No information available
Who the charity helped
    No information available
How the charity helped
    No information available