Accounts and annual returns WINDSOR OLD PEOPLE'S WELFARE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 203625
Charity reporting is overdue by 1702 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 241 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 241 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 606 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 606 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 972 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 972 days
Annual return 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1337 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1337 days
Annual return 31 March 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1702 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1702 days