Financial history WINDSOR OLD PEOPLE'S WELFARE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 203625
Charity reporting is overdue by 1534 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015
Total gross income £18.60k £29.66k £42.23k £50.39k £57.97k
Total expenditure £22.18k £24.77k £50.26k £50.95k £58.22k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £13.96k