CATS PROTECTION

Charity number: 203644
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 27 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 27 October 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 06 November 2020 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 06 November 2020 6 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 21 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 21 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 30 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 30 August 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 14 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 14 July 2017 On time Download