CATS PROTECTION

Charity number: 203644
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £55.55m £62.87m £67.95m £73.15m £71.97m
Total expenditure £53.83m £61.14m £66.17m £71.27m £66.47m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £2.03m
Income - Donations and legacies £41.34m £45.29m £46.91m £58.53m £50.67m
Income - Other trading activities £10.92m £14.38m £17.78m £11.10m £16.26m
Income - Charitable activities £1.88m £1.98m £1.91m £2.10m £1.68m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.29m £1.10m £1.21m £1.22m £1.03m
Income - Other £117.00k £127.00k £147.00k £204.00k £2.34m
Income - Legacies £26.13m £30.00m £31.55m £35.38m £33.34m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £34.86m £38.24m £42.19m £45.64m £42.09m
Expenditure - Raising funds £18.97m £22.90m £23.98m £25.63m £24.38m
Expenditure - Governance £169.00k £246.00k £246.00k £204.00k £94.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £207.00k £199.00k £200.00k £213.00k £201.00k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0