Accounts and annual returns CHARITY FOR ECCLESIASTICAL PURPOSES IN CONNECTION WITH THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND

Charity number: 203680
Charity reporting is overdue by 18 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2023 Overdue Overdue by 18 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Overdue Overdue by 18 days
Annual return 05 April 2022 09 August 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 09 March 2022 32 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 25 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 06 July 2020 152 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required