Exeter Church Charities

Charity number: 203721
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
KEVIN BUTLER Trustee 08 April 2014 None on record
ALDERMAN JOHN FREDERICK LANDERS Trustee 30 June 2013
THE HARDING FUND Received: On time
ANITA LONG Trustee 06 October 2010 None on record
REV SIMON AUSTEN Trustee 09 October 2017
ST LEONARD WITH HOLY TRINITY EXETER RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY Received: On time
Laura Wright Trustee 02 December 2018 None on record
LESLEY HOWARD Trustee 06 January 2016 None on record
DILYS BALDWIN Chair 30 June 2013 None on record
Alderman NORMAN SHIEL Trustee 06 October 2016
ST LEONARD'S CHRISTIAN TRUST Received: On time
AGE UK EXETER Received: 2 days late
ST LEONARD'S NEIGHBOURHOOD ASSOCIATION Received: On time
ST LEONARD WITH HOLY TRINITY EXETER RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY Received: On time
THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF MARDON CENTRE Received: On time
CLLR KEITH OWEN Trustee 26 July 2016 None on record
Dr IAN HOWARD Trustee 06 January 2016
EXETER DIOCESAN ASSOCIATION FOR THE CARE OF WOMEN AND CHILDREN (SAINT OLAVE'S TRUST) Received: On time
ALDERMAN MRS MARGARET DANKS Trustee 15 April 2014 None on record