Financial history BAKER AND TUCKER ALMSHOUSE CHARITY (OTHERWISE BOURTON ALMSHOUSES)

Charity number: 203879
Charity reporting is overdue by 301 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £17.02k £16.98k £17.60k £17.54k £16.57k
Total expenditure £9.79k £23.16k £56.45k £4.73k £18.71k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A