Financial history THE SOWTER TRUST

Charity number: 203972
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £2.31k £2.38k £1.78k £2.48k £2.49k
Total expenditure £3.24k £300 £0 £500 £5.77k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A