DEVON AND EXETER SPASTICS SOCIETY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
Governance
- 28 February 1962: Standard registration
- 21 July 1994: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION OF SOCIETY DATED 10TH JULY 1961 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION ADOPTED AT AGM HELD ON 27TH MAY 1970 AS AMENDED 28TH OCTOBER 1991
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE AND ASSIST IN PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR TREATMENT, EDUCATION, TRAINING AND THE GENERAL WELFARE OF SUFFERERS FROM CEREBRAL PALSY AND ITS ALLIED CONDITIONS AND TO ADVISE HELP AND CATER FOR THE NEEDS OF PARENTS OF CEREBRAL PALSY SUFFERERS AND OF THOSE CARING FOR THEM.
Area of benefit
DEVON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.