ST PETERS ALMSHOUSE CHARITIES

Charity number: 204049
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £21.31k £12.59k £15.11k £18.49k £17.58k
Total expenditure £22.32k £6.74k £19.21k £13.73k £23.04k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £3.00k £0 £0 N/A N/A