WRIGHT'S CLOCK LAND

Charity number: 204069
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £1.37k £1.37k £1.37k £3.27k £8.91k
Total expenditure £7.74k £5.03k £1.00k £7.66k £25.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A