WRIGHT'S CLOCK LAND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Established in 1525 to keep the clock of St Vigor's Church, Fulbourn in repair and any surplus to be used to repair the steeple and bells.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- WRIGHT'S CLOCK FUND (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.37k | £1.37k | £1.37k | £3.27k | £8.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.74k | £5.03k | £1.00k | £7.66k | £25.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 01 March 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED POLL DATED 13TH APRIL 16. HEN V.111 (1525) SEE P.R. 31 PAGE 116 AND SCHEME OF 23.1.1885 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 21 JUN 1973 AS AMENDED ON 14 APR 2020
Charitable objects
1. THE MAINTENANCE, CLEANING, REPAIR, ALTERATION, RENEWAL AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE CLOCK AND BELLS AND THEIR ASSOCIATED EQUIPMENT AND THE TOWER CONTAINING THEM OF THE PARISH CHURCH OF ST VIGOR WITH ALL SAINTS AT FULBOURN CAMBRIDGESHIRE AND SUBJECT THERETO 2. THE MAINTENANCE, CLEANING, REPAIR, ALTERATION, RENEWAL AND IMPROVEMENT OF ANY OTHER PARTS OF THE ENTIRETY OF THE BUILDINGS, FABRIC, FITTINGS, FURNISHINGS FACILITIES AND EQUIPMENT AND THE CHURCHYARD, GRAVES, MONUMENTS AND BOUNDARY WALLS OF THE SAID PARISH CHURCH 3. THE ADVANCEMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE PARISH OF ST VIGOR WITH ALL SAINTS FULBOURN OF ANY OR ALL OF THOSE PURPOSES WHICH ARE RECOGNISED AS CHARITABLE (ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES) AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT BY MAKING GRANTS BOTH TO ORGANISATIONS (INCLUDING THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF ST VIGOR WITH ALL SAINTS) AND TO INDIVIDUALS IN THE PARISH OF ST VIGOR WITH ALL SAINTS FULBOURN
Area of benefit
PARISH OF FULBOURN
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window