THE ROCK AND FAR FOREST NURSING CHARITY

Charity number: 204102
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2020 04 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2019 01 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2018 31 December 2019 122 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2017 23 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2016 22 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2016 Not Required