THE ROCK AND FAR FOREST NURSING CHARITY

Charity number: 204102
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/10/2016 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020
Total gross income £270 £831 £270 £474 £500
Total expenditure £92 £218 £218 £167 £183
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A