COOMBE COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity number: 204158
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £15.74k £13.57k £13.16k £12.13k £2.06k
Total expenditure £28.30k £10.83k £12.04k £12.29k £3.68k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £9.22k £0 £3.18k £1.00k N/A