LADY ANNE MORTON'S ALMSHOUSE

Charity number: 204315
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £13.76k £12.42k £13.72k £13.72k £18.75k
Total expenditure £7.89k £12.74k £7.68k £7.68k £15.54k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A