THE WIVELISCOMBE DISPENSARY TRUST

Charity number: 204333
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 04 February 2020 20 January 2021 47 days late
Accounts and TAR 04 February 2020 Not Required
Annual return 04 February 2019 21 August 2020 261 days late
Accounts and TAR 04 February 2019 Not Required
Annual return 04 February 2018 18 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 04 February 2018 Not Required
Annual return 04 February 2017 24 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 04 February 2017 Not Required
Annual return 04 February 2016 01 February 2017 59 days late
Accounts and TAR 04 February 2016 Not Required