BERKELEY PAROCHIAL TRUST

Charity number: 204334
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £7.55k £7.99k £9.55k £9.45k £9.58k
Total expenditure £1.99k £5.22k £2.52k £2.60k £3.02k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A