BERKELEY PAROCHIAL TRUST

Charity number: 204334
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF 31 MAY 1889 AS VARIED BY SCHEMES OF 23 DECEMBER 1896, 9 FEBRUARY 1912, 28 SEPTEMBER 1951, 20 DECEMBER 1978.
Charitable objects
FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE POOR.
Area of benefit
ANCIENT PARISH OF BERKELEY (EXCEPT THE CHAPELRY OF STONE)
Registration history
  • 05 March 1962 : Standard registration
  • 22 November 2001 : Removed
  • 22 November 2001 : Asset transfer out