BERKELEY PAROCHIAL TRUST

Charity number: 204334
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Gareth Langdon Trustee 18 March 2019
HAM AND STONE GREENS Received: On time
Susan Angus Trustee 11 March 2019
BERKELEY GRAMMAR SCHOOL EDUCATIONAL FUND Received: On time
JUDITH CAROLE LE RICHE Trustee 05 February 2019 None on record
Gordon Harcourt Trustee 15 October 2018 None on record
SHAUN BROWN Trustee 15 May 2018 None on record
HEATHER PRIESTLEY Trustee 05 March 2015 None on record
DAVID JOHN TANDY Trustee 05 February 2019
THE ALKINGTON CHARITY Received: On time
EUGENE PETER CAMPER Chair 02 June 2015 None on record