CHARITY OF WILLIAM SEARLE

Charity number: 204508
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 08 November 2021 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 01 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 20 March 2020 141 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 28 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 21 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required