THE POOR'S LAND

Charity number: 204546
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £10.87k £9.93k £11.57k £10.10k £9.95k
Total expenditure £2.24k £1.52k £9.22k £9.16k £15.46k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A