Trustees THE POOR'S LAND
Charity number: 204546
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NIGEL BRETT COLLARD | Chair | 27 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Rev Mark Haworth | Trustee | 28 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Brendan Goodjohn | Trustee | 25 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jonathon Allen | Trustee | 15 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Griffin | Trustee | 18 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Elliott Spray | Trustee | 18 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anna Wilson | Trustee | 25 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
PENELOPE MAYO | Trustee | 28 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
ROSEMARY HIGGS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PETER SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.