THE BRISTOL BENEVOLENT INSTITUTION

Charity number: 204592
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £551.15k £561.89k £553.36k £608.85k £463.71k
Total expenditure £516.68k £626.57k £845.31k £770.24k £613.54k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £613 £74 £351 £16.92k N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment £550.54k £561.81k £553.01k £591.92k N/A
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £516.10k £625.10k £844.16k £726.72k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £582 £1.47k £1.15k £43.52k N/A
Expenditure - Governance £14.42k £13.97k £14.41k £15.67k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £160.00k £12.00k N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £582 £1.47k £1.15k £43.52k N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A