PLYMOUTH DEAF ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 204626
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 01 February 2021 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 31 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 07 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 07 November 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 28 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

28 September 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 24 June 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

24 June 2016 On time Download