Linked charities BRISTOL CHARITIES
Charity number: 204665
Removed charity
Linked charities
- ALDERMAN JOHN WHITSON'S CHARITY FOR POOR HOUSEHOLDERS (BRISTOL MUNICIPAL CHARITIES FOR RELIEF IN NEED)
- ALDERMAN JOHN WHITSON'S CHARITY FOR POOR WIDOWS (BRISTOL MUNICIPAL CHARITIES FOR RELIEF IN NEED)
- ALDERMAN JOHN WHITSON'S CHARITY FOR POOR WOMEN IN CHILDBED(BRISTOL MUNICIPAL CHARITIES FOR RELIEF IN NEED)
- ALDERMAN JOHN WHITSON'S NON-EDUCATIONAL CHARITIES
- ALDERMAN JOSEPH JACKSON (BRISTOL MUNICIPAL CHARITIES FOR RELIEF IN NEED)
- ALDERMAN ROBERT KITCHEN
- ALICE COLE FOR POOR HOUSEHOLDERS (BRISTOL MUNICIPAL CHARITIES FOR RELIEF IN NEED)
- ALICE COLE FOR POOR OF PARISH OF ST JAMES BRISTOL (BRISTOL MUNICIPAL CHARITIES FOR RELIEF IN NEED)
- BRISTOL CHARITIES SERVICES
- BRISTOL GUILD OF THE HANDICAPPED TRUST
- BRISTOL MUNICIPAL CHARITIES' RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
- BRISTOL RELIEF IN SICKNESS AND NURSES CHARITY
- DAME SARAH HABERFIELD (BRISTOL MUNICIPAL CHARITIES FOR RELIEF IN NEED)
- DR CHARLES SLOPER
- DR GEORGE OWEN
- DR THOMAS WHITE FOR MARRIAGE PORTIONS (BRISTOL MUNICIPAL CHARITIES FOR RELIEF IN NEED)
- EDITH LOUISA GARLICK (BRISTOL MUNICIPAL CHARITIES FOR RELIEF IN NEED)
- EDMUND LANE (BRISTOL MUNICIPAL CHARITIES FOR RELIEF IN NEED)
- EDWARD PHILIPS TRUST (BRISTOL MUNICIPAL CHARITIES FOR RELIEF IN NEED)
- ELIZABETH ASH (BRISTOL MUNICIPAL CHARITIES FOR RELIEF IN NEED)
- FRANCIS FULLER (BRISTOL MUNICIPAL CHARITIES FOR RELIEF IN NEED)
- GEORGE HARRINGTON (BRISTOL MUNICIPAL CHARITIES FOR RELIEF IN NEED)
- GROVE HOUSE HOME FUND
- GUARDIAN HOUSE CHARITY
- HENRY HERBERT WILLS ANNUITY TRUST (BRISTOL MUNICIPAL CHARITIES FOR RELIEF IN NEED)
- HUMPHREY BROWN FOR POOR OF PARISH OF IRON ACTON (BRISTOL MUNICIPAL CHARITIES FOR RELIEF IN NEED)
- HUMPHREY BROWN FOR POOR OF PARISH OF WESTBURY-ON-TRYM (BRISTOL MUNICIPAL CHARITIES FOR RELIEF IN NEED)
- JAMES YEADON (BRISTOL MUNICIPAL CHARITIES FOR RELIEF IN NEED)
- JOHN MERLOTT'S CHARITY FOR THE BLIND (WITH SUBSIDIARY ENDOWMENTS)
- JOHN PEARCE'S GIFT
- LEIR FUND
- MARGARET EDGAR (BRISTOL MUNICIPAL CHARITIES FOR RELIEF IN NEED)
- MARY ANN PELOQUIN FOR POOR FREEMEN (BRISTOL MUNICIPAL CHARITIES FOR RELIEF IN NEED)
- MARY ANN PELOQUIN FOR POOR LYING IN WOMEN (BRISTOL MUNICIPAL CHARITIES FOR RELIEF IN NEED)
- MARY ANN PELOQUIN FOR POOR OF ST STEPHEN'S (BRISTOL MUNICIPAL CHARITIES FOR RELIEF IN NEED)
- MARY BECK (BRISTOL MUNICIPAL CHARITIES FOR RELIEF IN NEED)
- MARY CARPENTER MEMORIAL
- MISS ANN CASAMAJOR
- MISS ELIZABETH LUDLOW (BRISTOL MUNICIPAL CHARITIES FOR RELIEF IN NEED)
- MISS ELLEN MARRIOTT (BRISTOL MUNICIPAL CHARITIES FOR RELIEF IN NEED)
- MISS HANNAH LUDLOW (BRISTOL MUNICIPAL CHARITIES FOR RELIEF IN NEED)
- MISS HANNAH MARRIOTT (BRISTOL MUNICIPAL CHARITIES FOR RELIEF IN NEED)
- MRS ANN THURSTON (BRISTOL MUNICIPAL CHARITIES FOR RELIEF IN NEED)
- MRS CATHERINE MARY CASTLE'S TRUST (BRISTOL MUNICIPAL CHARITIES FOR RELIEF IN NEED)
- ORCHARD HOMES
- PERRETT'S HOMES
- REVEREND DR THOMAS WHITE'S ESSEX ESTATES
- REVEREND DR THOMAS WHITE'S GRAY'S INN LANE TRUST
- RICHARD HUGHES
- RICHARD REYNOLDS
- RICHARD REYNOLDS (II) CHARITY
- SAILORS COLLEGE PENSION CHARITY (BRISTOL MUNICIPAL CHARITIES FOR RELIEF IN NEED)
- SAMUEL GIST (BRISTOL MUNICIPAL CHARITIES FOR RELIEF IN NEED)
- SION HOSPITAL (BRISTOL) CHARITY
- SIR ABRAHAM ELTON (BRISTOL MUNICIPAL CHARITIES FOR RELIEF IN NEED)
- THE AUGUSTUS PHILLIPS FOUNDATION (BRISTOL MUNICIPAL CHARITIES FOR RELIEF IN NEED
- THE BRISTOL DISPENSARY AND RELIEF IN SICKNESS CHARITY
- THE SOLDIERS' CORNER IN ARNOS VALE CEMETERY
- THOMAS BONVILLE FOR POOR HOUSEKEEPERS (BRISTOL MUNICIPAL CHARITIES FOR RELIEF IN NEED)
- THOMAS BONVILLE FOR POOR RESIDENTS (BRISTOL MUNICIPAL CHARITIES FOR RELIEF IN NEED)
- THOMAS CHESTER'S CHARITY FOR ALMSPEOPLE
- THOMAS GIRLING MEMORIAL FUND
- THOMAS HOLBIN (BRISTOL MUNICIPAL CHARITIES FOR RELIEF IN NEED)
- THOMAS WHITE
- W C F BLACKMORE'S GIFT
- W C H BISHOP MEMORIAL FUND
- WEBB'S HOME TRUST
- WHITSON'S LYING IN CHARITY (BRISTOL MUNICIPAL CHARITIES FOR RELIEF IN NEED)
- WILLIAM BARROW (BRISTOL MUNICIPAL CHARITIES FOR RELIEF IN NEED)
- WILLIAM EMMETT HABGOOD (BRISTOL MUNICIPAL CHARITIES FOR RELIEF IN NEED)
Governing document
FEOFFMENT DATED 16 MARCH 1621 AND BY WILL DATED 27 MARCH 1621 AND BY WILL DATED 27 MARCH 1627. SCHEME OF 2 NOVEMBER 1926 AND SCHEME OF 28 JULY 1942 AND 26 APRIL 1973
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS PREFERENCE TO BE GIVEN TO POOR MEN OVER 55 YEARS.
Area of benefit
BRISTOL.
Registration history
- 27 April 1962 : Standard registration
- 10 October 2005 : Removed
- 10 October 2005 : Asset transfer out
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.