HAWLEY WAR MEMORIAL HALL MAINTENANCE FUND

Charity number: 204683
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 18 February 2021 18 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 16 February 2021 382 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 15 February 2021 746 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 05 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 02 March 2017 30 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required