Trustees THE LEAMINGTON SPA COMPETITIVE FESTIVAL
Charity number: 204777
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Catherine Danica Bower BMus Hons | Chair | 15 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Emily Hopper BMus Hons | Trustee | 09 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Bethany Toulson | Trustee | 17 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jo-Ann Kim Fowler | Trustee | 17 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael Rose | Trustee | 17 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Isabelle Mathews | Trustee | 22 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Helena Duncan LLAM FSTSD | Trustee | 30 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Felicity Kate Rothery | Trustee | 09 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Jayne Collins | Trustee | 09 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
David Lawrence Grove Mr | Trustee | 19 August 2013 |
|
|||||
COLLEEN BILLINGTON | Trustee | 19 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
KATHRYN HEATHCOTE | Trustee | 22 April 2011 |
|
|
||||
ADRIAN MOORE BA, ARCO | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.