THE CITY ARTS TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 204828
Charity reporting is overdue by 636 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 270 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 270 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 636 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 636 days
Annual return 31 March 2018 22 February 2019 22 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 11 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 11 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2015 05 July 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2015 05 July 2016 On time Download