THE CITY ARTS TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 204828
Charity reporting is overdue by 636 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2013 30/09/2014 30/09/2015 31/03/2017 31/03/2018
Total gross income £1.17m £1.40m £1.28m £403.40k £1.01k
Total expenditure £1.24m £1.57m £1.31m £378.00k £1.01k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £386.18k £343.78k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £750.29k £903.06k £838.19k N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £424.48k £498.68k £445.91k N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Investment £81 £105 £85 N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.19m £1.53m £1.25m N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £4.01k £6.01k £6.01k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A