UNITED NON-ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITIES

Charity number: 204834
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £1.31k £1.30k £1.27k £1.27k £1.31k
Total expenditure £320 £320 £1.27k £320 £320
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A