Financial history KETTERING DISTRICT ALMALGAMATED CLUBS COMMITTEE FOR THE BLIND

Charity number: 204850
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021
Total gross income £3.02k £2.59k £4.68k £0 £0
Total expenditure £1.22k £715 £840 £888 £250
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A