Financial history LEATHERHEAD AND DISTRICT COUNTRYSIDE PROTECTION SOCIETY

Charity number: 204862
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £743 £739 £785 £700 £866
Total expenditure £633 £643 £3.82k £950 £642
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A