THE FRIENDS OF CLIFF HOUSE WOODS

Charity number: 204865
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £277 £17 £550 £459 £528
Total expenditure £376 £193 £303 £195 £188
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A