MILTON KEYNES MENCAP SOCIETY

Charity number: 204878
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 28/02/2016 28/02/2017 28/02/2018 28/02/2019 29/02/2020
Total gross income £16.50k £6.05k £21.92k £19.41k £22.94k
Total expenditure £28.90k £6.54k £24.20k £25.42k £26.49k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A