Financial history WISBECH CHARITIES

Charity number: 204879
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £100.35k £101.87k £106.78k £103.01k £103.01k
Total expenditure £88.21k £94.86k £64.97k £76.32k £76.32k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A £2.24k N/A N/A