ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS SOLENT BRANCH

Charity number: 205096
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 08 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 08 September 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 18 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 18 August 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 28 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018

(These accounts
have been qualified)

28 August 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 31 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 10 December 2018 40 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 22 December 2017 52 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

22 December 2017 52 days late Download