ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS SOLENT BRANCH

Charity number: 205096
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £1.27m £1.18m £1.68m £1.06m £1.29m
Total expenditure £1.43m £998.79k £981.56k £1.02m £928.33k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £102.33k
Income - Donations and legacies £591.21k £616.11k £1.13m £391.63k £668.21k
Income - Other trading activities £331.28k £343.19k £354.30k £454.83k £462.93k
Income - Charitable activities £327.14k £192.24k £168.52k £180.13k £113.63k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £23.55k £31.12k £36.30k £37.67k £43.44k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £415.07k £461.30k £1.02m £248.43k £411.02k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.42m £994.42k £977.58k £1.02m £926.22k
Expenditure - Raising funds £15.24k £4.37k £3.99k £3.62k £0
Expenditure - Governance £5.43k £0 £0 £0 £6.98k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £2.11k