ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS CHELTENHAM AND EAST GLOUCESTERSHIRE BRANCH

Charity number: 205097
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 27 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 29 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 07 December 2019 37 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 05 July 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 29 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 23 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 11 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 11 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 15 June 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 15 June 2016 On time Download