Accounts and annual returns CLIFTON ELDER PEOPLES CLUB

Charity number: 205111
Charity reporting is overdue by 485 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 120 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 120 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 485 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 485 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 27 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 01 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 27 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required