THE FREE HOSPITAL FUND FOR CHILDREN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Grants to buy shoes and clothes for children, who are sick or from families who have health problems
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 04 May 1962: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Reuben Stanley | Chair | 03 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
James David Gambier Fenton | Trustee | 30 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Hilary Woodliffe | Trustee | 06 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Heather Julie Sutcliffe | Trustee | 06 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr Graham Cole | Trustee | 16 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
DEBORAH CLARE FENTON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.84k | £24.32k | £24.96k | £25.30k | £25.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.22k | £17.11k | £25.12k | £22.55k | £29.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEMES OF THE 26TH FEBRUARY 1951 24TH FEBRUARY 1953 AND 12TH APRIL 1973, SCHEME 24 MAY 1999. AMENDMENT 28 JULY 1999
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF SICK AND SUFFERING CHILDREN OF THE POOR.
Area of benefit
GLOUCESTER
Contact information
- Address:
-
Gloucestershire County Council
Shire Hall
Gloucester
GL1 2TG
- Phone:
- 01452328071
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window