ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS BOURNEMOUTH, NEW FOREST AND DISTRICT BRANCH

Charity number: 205126
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £137.43k £188.18k £239.52k £164.27k £314.97k
Total expenditure £150.75k £153.53k £179.27k £206.21k £247.91k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A