Financial history CHARITY OF JOHN CAREWAY

Charity number: 205143
Charity reporting is overdue by 30 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £7.97k £7.16k £5.96k £13.39k £6.07k
Total expenditure £8.57k £5.82k £6.29k £5.87k £6.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A