ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS ALTON, HASLEMERE AND PETERSFIELD BRANCH

Charity number: 205153
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 19 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 19 September 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 04 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 04 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 02 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 02 August 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 07 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 07 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 13 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 13 June 2017 On time Download